Featured Posts

CBSE Assignments class 09 Mathematics

  Mathematics Assignments & Worksheets  For  Class IX Chapter-wise mathematics assignment for class 09. Important and useful extra questions strictly according to the CBSE syllabus and pattern with answer key CBSE Mathematics is a very good platform for the students and is contain the assignments for the students from 9 th  to 12 th  standard.  Here students can find very useful content which is very helpful to handle final examinations effectively.  For better understanding of the topic students should revise NCERT book with all examples and then start solving the chapter-wise assignments.  These assignments cover all the topics and are strictly according to the CBSE syllabus.  With the help of these assignments students can easily achieve the examination level and  can reach at the maximum height. Class 09 Mathematics    Assignment Case Study Based Questions Class IX 

Maths Trick Shortcut way of calculating the numbers

Maths Trick Shortcut way of calculating the numbers

maths calculation shortcuts, maths tricks for fast calculation, maths tricks for fast multiplication, math tricks with answer, maths tricks for competitive exams, easy multiplication tricks for large numbers, mental math tricks to become a human calculator

Trick No. 1 : Multiplying any number by 11
If you want to multiply any number by 11, start from right to left. 

Write first digit(unit digit) as it is. 

Add the first and second digit and Wright it at second place (tens place). 

If the sum is greater than 9 then take the carry to the next sum. 

Continue like this and finally write the last digit as it is.

Example:-
7857 x 11 =   First digit = 7

For Second  digit = 5+7 = 12  this is imply that second digit is 2 and 1 is taken as carry with the next step.

For third digit = 8+5 = 13 + 1(carry)=14  this is imply that third digit is 4 and 1 is taken as carry with the next step.

For fourth digit = 7+8+1(carry) = 16  this is imply that fourth digit is 6 and 1 is taken as carry with the next step.

For fifth digit = 7+1(carry) = 8  this is imply that fifth digit is 8

Arranging all these digits we get 7857 x 11 = 86427

Trick No. 2 : Multiplying any number by 99999…….

 

Multiplication with 9999….. is always difficult because 9 is the last most digit on the multiplication table. But multiplication with 9  can be made very easy because it is nearest to 10. For this we follow the following steps.

 To multiply any number by 9999….. , simple we put zeros after the given number as there are 9’s in the multiplication and from the result subtract the number itself.

 Example:-


       3456 x 9 = 34560 - 3456     = 31104

 

    3456 x 99 = 345600 – 3456   = 342144

 

3456 x 999   = 3456000 - 3456  = 3452544

 

3456 x 999999 = 3456000000 – 3456 = 3455996544

 

This trick always provide you the correct result without any multiplication.


Trick No 3 :- Squaring any number of  9

(9999)2 = 9999 x 9999 =  99980001

 

Trick:- 

Write the given number(9999), subtract 1 from the given number we get 9998.

 

Now Subtract 9998 from 9999 we get 0001

 

Place 0001 after 9998 we get 99980001 [Result of the multiplication]



Trick No 4 :- Multiplying any number with equal number of 999…

        349 x 999 = 348651

Trick :-   349-1 = 348

          999-348 = 651

So Result of the multiplication is  348651
............................................................... 

  56789 x 99999 = 5678843211

Trick :- 56789-1 = 56788

    99999-56788 = 43211

So result of the multiplication is 5678843211

Trick No 5 :- Method of finding the square of any two digit number  with sum of the unit digit = 10 and same tens digits.

25 x 25 = 625

Trick :- Multiply unit digit = 5 x5 = 25

(2+1) x 2 = 6

Result of the multiplication is 625

53 x 57 = 3021

Trick :- Multiply unit digit = 3 x 7 = 21

(5+1) x 5 = 30

Result of the multiplication is 3021

98 x 92 = 9016

Trick :- Multiply unit digit = 8 x 2 = 16

(9+1) x 9 = 90

Result of the multiplication is 9016


Trick No 6 :- Method of finding the square of any two digit number

(32)2 = 1024

Trick : square of unit digit = 2 x 2 = 4(unit digit)

3 x 2 x 2 = 12 ( take 2 as tens digit and 1 as carry)

3 x 3 = 9 + 1(carry) = 10 ( Last two digits)

Result of the multiplication : 1024

(67)2 = 4489

Trick : square of unit digit = 7 x 7 = 49(unit digit 9 and 4 as carry)

6 x 7 x 2 = 84 + 4(carry) = 88 ( take 8 as tens digit and 8 as carry)

6 x 6 = 36 + 8(carry) = 44 ( Last two digits)

Result of the multiplication : 4489

Trick No 7 :- Simple method of multiplication ( Useful for the starters)


36 x 29 = (30 + 6) x (20 + 9)
x
30
6

20
20 x 30 = 600
20 x 6 = 120

9
9 x 30 = 270
9 x 6 = 54

Add
            = 870
           = 174
1044

332 x 289 = (300 + 30 + 2) x (200 + 80 + 9)
X
300
30
2
Add
200
60000
6000
400
66400
80
24000
2400
160
26560
9
2700
270
18
2988
Add
86700
8670
578
95948

Trick No 8 :- Trick for the square and square root

A number ending with 2, 3, 7, 8 is never a perfect square.
Square root of even number is even and square root of odd number is odd.


THANKS FOR YOUR VISIT
PLEASE COMMENT BELOW
🙏

Comments

Breaking News

Popular Post on this Blog

Lesson Plan Maths Class 10 | For Mathematics Teacher

Theorems on Quadrilaterals Ch-8 Class-IX

Lesson Plan Math Class X (Ch-13) | Surface Area and Volume

SUBSCRIBE FOR NEW POSTS

Followers